DC PR25-0804 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Committee Mark-up of PR25-0804
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Committee Mark-up of PR25-0804
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Association of Colleges and Universities, Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2024
Title
American Association of Colleges and Universities, Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0804 |
2024-07-02 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-06-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2024-05-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0804 Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0804 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55441/Introduction/PR25-0804-Introduction.pdf |