DE HB125 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is intended to facilitate the growth and expansion of Delaware licensed craft alcoholic beverage companies within the State by permitting them to continue to grow and expand in an increasingly competitive environment. This bill does not change the position of craft alcoholic beverage companies in the traditional three-tier system.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Craft Alcoholic Beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. David McBride [D] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Sen. David Sokola [D] |
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Krista Griffith [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] | Rep. Lyndon Yearick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-07 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2019-05-07 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-07 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 125 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-05-07 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 125 - Stricken in House | |
2019-05-06 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 125 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |