DE HB182 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides the Family Court with discretion to determine whether it is appropriate to designate juvenile offenders who are under age fourteen on the date of the offense or who were over age fourteen on the date of the offense but did not commit one of the offenses enumerated in 771-78 of Title 11 (for which registration is required pursuant to the federal Adam Walsh Act) as sex offenders, thus subjecting them to the registration and reporting requirements under Delaware law. This bill further provides for a review of registration for those persons who were under age fourteen on the date of the offense or who were over age fourteen on the date of the offense but did not commit one of the offenses enumerated in 771-78 of Title 11 (for which registration is required pursuant to the federal Adam Walsh Act). This Bill does not adversely affect Delaware’s compliance with the federal Adam Walsh Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 10 And 11 Relating To Certain Offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Barbieri [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] |
Rep. James Johnson [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Sen. Robert Venables [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 5 NO 2 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-06-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-25 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-06-25 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House |
2013-06-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-06-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-06-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2013-06-06 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |