DE HB185 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The City of Delaware City (“City”) appointed a charter committee to review and suggest updates to the City’s charter. The charter committee met on several occasions to discuss the charter and submitted recommendations to the City’s solicitor for review and comment. After public hearings, revisions to the charter were prepared for submission to the General Assembly for approval. The main substantive charter revisions are as follows: requiring administrative reporting for elected officials; clarifying annexation provisions and procedures; clarifying the qualifications and duties for Mayor and Councilpersons; addressing forfeiture of elected office for violating ethical standards; clarifying the proper methods for conducting public meetings; clarifying the Mayor’s authority to cast tie-breaking votes; addressing the establishment of reserve funds; increasing the lawful amount of indebtedness the City my incur; revising municipal election procedures; and clarifying that the City maintains all defenses available under state and federal law for suits.
Title
An Act To Reincorporate The City Of Delaware City.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |
2013-06-19 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-19 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-06-19 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-06-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-06-06 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to House Administration Committee |
2013-06-06 | House | Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |