DE HB270 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires all contractors, subcontractors and independent contractors performing work under a public works contract to have an occupational and/or business license. Furthermore, this bill requires that all contractors verify that its subcontractors and independent contractors have an occupational and/or business licenses. A violation of this new section may result in a civil penalty.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Works Contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Rep. Michael Mulrooney [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Rep. D.E. Williams [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate |
2014-05-13 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-13 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-05-13 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2014-05-08 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-05-06 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |