DE HB279 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on October 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on October 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes certification and continuing education requirements for central service technicians working in hospitals and freestanding surgical centers. Central service technicians are an important part of the healthcare team responsible for decontaminating, inspecting, assembling, disassembling, packaging, and sterilizing reusable surgical instruments and equipment. This Act requires individuals who perform the tasks of a central service technician to pass a nationally accredited examination and to hold either a certified registered central service technician credential or certified sterile processing and distribution technician credential within 18 months of hire. This Act grandfathers anyone working as a central service technician in a health care facility on or before January 1, 2023.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Certification Of Central Service Technicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-05-11 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 Favorable | |
2022-04-05 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2022-04-05 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-04-05 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 279 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-04-04 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 279 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-03-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |