DE HB319 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - HS 1 for HB 319 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 27 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - HS 1 for HB 319 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 27 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
As existing law has failed to make licensed midwifery services available to Delaware mothers who do not belong to very specific religious sects, a public process was followed in 2013-2014 to identify a better system, incorporating both Delaware systems, and other states' best practices for midwifery licensure. This public process included a broad cross-section of interested stakeholders. This bill establishes a Midwifery Advisory Council, which reports to the Board of Medical Licensure and Discipline. The Council is responsible for 1) procedures for the issuance of a midwife license, 2) license renewal process, 3) apprentice midwife permit requirements, 4) standards for education and apprentice training programs, 4) continuing education requirements for licensed midwives, and 5) practice standards for licensed midwives. Practice standards include many areas which will be developed by the Council through a public process. The Council is also responsible for considering, and recommending to the Board the suspension and revocation of midwifery licenses. There are several requirements to be licensed as a Delaware midwife, one of which is holding at least one of the following two national midwife credentials: CPM, Certified Professional Midwife, and CM, a Certified Midwife. Note that Certified Nurse Midwives (CNMs) are already regulated in the Delaware Code. Section 2 of the bill requires that when a birth is planned to occur outside of an institution, this fact will be noted when the birth is reported to the State.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 16 And 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating Of Midwifery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | House | HS 1 for HB 319 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 27 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | House | HS 1 for HB 319 - Lifted From Table in House |
2014-06-24 | House | HS 1 for HB 319 - Laid On Table in House |
2014-06-24 | House | HS 1 FOR HB 319 - Amendment HA 3 - Stricken |
2014-06-24 | House | HS 1 FOR HB 319 - Amendment HA 3 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-24 | House | HS 1 FOR HB 319 - Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-24 | House | HS 1 FOR HB 319 - Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-24 | House | HS 1 FOR HB 319 - Amendment HA 2 to HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-24 | House | HS 1 FOR HB 319 - Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Stricken |
2014-06-24 | House | HS 1 FOR HB 319 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-24 | House | HS 1 FOR HB 319 - Amendment HA 2 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-24 | House | HS 1 FOR HB 319 - Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-17 | House | HS 1 for HB 319 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-11 | House | HS 1 for HB 319 - Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2014-06-03 | House | HS 1 for HB 319 - Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2014-05-01 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to Health & Human Development Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |