DE HB36 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill increases the Delaware driver license issuance period from 5 years to 8 years and learner permit issuance period from 60 days to 6 months. The division has seen a significant upward trend in customer volume in 2010 when compared to 2009. Specifically, the division’s customer volume has increased an average of 100 customers per day in our busiest facility and an average of 25 customers per day in our slowest facility. If this rate of growth continues, the DMV can expect to see between 6,200 and 25,000 additional customers in our facilities each year. By extending driver license issuance periods an additional three years the division estimates a reduction in customer volume of approximately 48,000 fewer customers each year, thus enabling the division to handle the continued population growth in Delaware.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Related To Driver License.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-03-30 | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2011-03-22 | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-03-17 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2011-03-17 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2011-03-16 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |