DE HB386 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires that individual, group, State employee, and public assistance insurance plans provide coverage for treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome. This Act suspends this requirement for individual and group insurance plans if, under the Affordable Care Act, the State is required to assume the cost of this coverage.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18, Title 29, And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Coverage For Treatment Of Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated With Streptococcal Infections And Pediatric Acute Onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-14 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 30 YES 7 NO 4 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |