DE HB402 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Previously, a school superintendent was required to notify the DMV any time a student was expelled from a public school, at which time the DMV was permitted to suspend or refuse to issue or renew the expelled student a drivers license. This bill eliminates the ability for the DMV to suspend a students drivers license who has been expelled from a public school.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 And Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Expulsion Of Students.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Lynn [D] | Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] |
Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-26 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 28 YES 12 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |