DE HB91 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends Delawares Consumer Fraud Act (Subchapter II, Chapter 25, Title 6 of the Code), to give Delaware consumers and businesses the protection against unfair acts or practices in commerce that the General Assembly intended to give them when it enacted the Consumer Fraud Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Prohibited Trade Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 NO | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-05-13 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2021-05-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2021-05-13 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 91 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-04-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-15 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 91 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-01-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |