DE HB99 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill increases the rate changes or deviations fee and the filing fee for form, advertising and/or rule filings for each insurance policy or annuity contract or application.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 8 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |
2013-06-20 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 3 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits |
2013-04-30 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |