DE SB150 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is intended to implement the recommendations of the General Assembly’s Joint Sunset Committee following its review of the Sustainable Energy Utility. The Committee recommended that the statute governing the SEU, Title 29, Section 8059 be amended to a) allow greater flexibility in the composition of the Board, b) include language about staggering the terms of Board members, c) provide standards for the removal of Board members, and d) state that Board members appointed by the Governor may be deemed to have resigned if they are absent from three consecutive Board meetings without good cause. The bill also implements the Committee’s recommendation that the organizational structure of the SEU be changed from the current model, which requires a contract administrator and a fiscal agent. Instead, the SEU’s day-to-day business shall be managed by an executive director, who reports directly to the SEU Oversight Board. The Executive Director will handle certain responsibilities previously assigned to the contract administrator and fiscal agent. The bill also implements the Committee’s recommendations that a) the SEU submit a public annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly, b) prepare certified financial statements each year, c) the SEU’s financial statements be audited every other year by an independent certified public accounting firm, d) the SEU prepare a three to five year strategic plan with input from stakeholder groups and the public, which plan shall include an educational component for the general public and a continued focus on residential energy efficiency projects, and e) the SEU Oversight Board is authorized to appoint an advisory committee or committees to assist the Board from time to time.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Sustainable Energy Utility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-07-01 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-18 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 12 NO 2 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 defeated |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |