DE SB236 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill: (a) extends the expiration date for any new issuance or renewal of an ADA placard from 3 years to 8 years for a specific person with a diagnosis of a permanent disability and changing the minimum age from 85 to 80 years or older, (b) extends the validity for a temporary disability from 5 weeks to 180 days, and (c) defines additional medical professionals acceptable to certify a disability application.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To License Plates And Parking Permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-25 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-06-25 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 236 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-06-06 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 236 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-05-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-26 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2024-03-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-03-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate |