DE SB295 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act strengthens the current practice of obtaining service letters for employment in child care facilities to protect children from workers who have engaged in prior acts that are prohibited by the Office of Child Care Licensing. The Act does all of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special Employment Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-23 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2024-05-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |