DE SB300 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 23 YES 15 NO 3 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 23 YES 15 NO 3 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires crisis pregnancy centers in this state to provide notice if the center is not licensed by this state as a medical facility and does not have a licensed medical provider who provides or directly supervises, in person, the provision of services. A violation of this Act is an unlawful practice under ยง 2513 of Title 6 and a violation of Subchapter II, Chapter 25 of Title 6.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Crisis Pregnancy Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 23 YES 15 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 3 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-13 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2024-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2024-05-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |