DE SB306 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes technical changes and updates to the Delaware workplace safety program. Under current law, qualifying employers who pay $3,161 or more in annual workers' compensation premiums may be eligible for lower insurance premiums under the workplace safety program. The Act changes that criteria to employers who currently qualify for the uniform experience rating plan as approved by the Insurance Commissioner or who otherwise qualify for the program pursuant to parameters set by the Insurance Commissioner by regulation. In addition, the Act provides that in determining safety credits for a qualified employer that was not experience-rated in the policy period expiring immediately prior to application of the safety credit, the formula for calculating safety credits will incorporate amounts determined by the Insurance Commissioner by regulation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Workplace Safety Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] | Sen. Kyra Hoffner [D] |
Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-12 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2024-06-11 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-11 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 306 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-11 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 306 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-07 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 306 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-05-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-20 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 306 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-05-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate |