FL H0029 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts sale for human use of diapers, incontinence undergarments, incontinence pads, & incontinence liners from sales & use tax.
Title
Tax Exemption for Diapers and Incontinence Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) |
2023-03-30 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-12-23 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2022-12-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-23 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2022-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S114 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
H7063 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-157
S7062 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)
H7063 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-157
S7062 (Similar To) 2023-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157)