FL H0073 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Chapter No. 2024-242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Chapter No. 2024-242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court to consider needs & abilities of person with developmental disability when determining whether to appoint guardian advocate; provides requirements for petition to appoint guardian advocate; authorizes agent acting for principal to grant supported decisionmaking agreement; prohibits such agreement from acting as durable power of attorney; provides certain communications shall be recognized as communication of principal; provides requirements for examining committee member when determining incapacitated person's ability to exercise his or her rights.
Title
Supported Decisionmaking Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#633 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#633 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Chapter No. 2024-242 | |
2024-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-06-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for SB 446 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2024-01-18 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-18 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-16 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-06 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-06 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-12-05 | House | Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-11-28 | House | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2023-10-05 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2023-09-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S446 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 73
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 5716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
709 | 2201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
709 | 2209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |