FL H0111 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-231
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-231
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises purposes for which DEP may provide grants under Resilient Florida Grant Program to counties, municipalities, & water management districts; requires state-financed constructors to take specified actions before commencing construction; requires DEP to develop specified sea level impact projection study standard; provides for civil actions, injunctive relief, recovery of certain funds, & enforcement; provides for future repeal of requirements for construction of certain structures in coastal building zone.
Title
Flooding and Sea Level Rise Vulnerability Studies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#137 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#137 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Chapter No. 2023-231 | |
2023-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-01 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1170 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-19 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-19 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-18 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023) |
2023-04-10 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-10 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-04-10 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-04-06 | House | Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda |
2023-03-22 | House | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-22 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-16 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-15 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee |
2023-03-13 | House | PCS added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-01-10 | House | Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee |
2023-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1170 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 111 (Ch. 2023-231)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
161 | 551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0937 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |