FL H0151 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Chapter No. 2024-92; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2024-231)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Chapter No. 2024-92; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2024-231)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain retirees to be reemployed after terminating employment; prohibiting such retirees from receiving both a salary from the employer and retirement benefits for a specified period after his or her retirement; removing provisions authorizing the reemployment of certain law enforcement officers as school resource officers; revising employer contribution rates to the Florida Retirement System, etc.
Title
Florida Retirement System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1001 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#583 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - House - House Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1001 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#583 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - House - House Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Chapter No. 2024-92; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2024-231) | |
2024-04-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-02 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-08 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2024-03-08 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (185131) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2024-03-08 | Senate | In returning messages |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 109, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted |
2024-03-08 | House | Amendment 185131 adopted |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2024-03-08 | House | Added to Conference Report Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Broxson (Chair), Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Agriculture, Environment, And General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Brodeur (Chair), Berman, Boyd, Garcia, Grall, Mayfield, Osgood, Polsky, Rodriguez, Trumbull, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Agriculture, Environment, And General Government/State Administration and Technology: Brodeur (Chair), Berman, Boyd, Garcia, Grall, Mayfield, Osgood, Polsky, Rodriguez, Trumbull, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Criminal And Civil Justice/Justice: Bradley (Chair), Baxley, Burgess, Hooper, Martin, Pizzo, Powell, Rouson, Torres, Yarborough, Albritton (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Education/Higher Education: Perry (Chair), Calatayud, Collins, Davis, Harrell, Hutson, Jones, Simon, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Education/PreK-12: Perry (Chair), Calatayud, Collins, Davis, Harrell, Hutson, Jones, Simon, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Rouson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Health And Human Services/Health Care: Harrell (Chair), Avila, Baxley, Book, Brodeur, Burgess, Burton, Davis, Garcia, Gruters, Rouson, Simon, Albritton (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee On Transportation, Tourism, And Economic Development/Infrastructure and Tourism: Hooper (Chair), DiCeglie, Stewart, Thompson, Trumbull, Wright, Yarborough, Albritton (At Large), Baxley (At Large), Book (At Large), Hutson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Perry (At Large), Rouson (At Large); |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations) |
2024-02-26 | House | Conference Committee appointed |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations) |
2024-02-08 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The Senate having refused to pass the bill as passed by the House, acceded to the request for a conference |
2024-02-08 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (693208) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7024 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-08 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-08 | House | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2024-02-08 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-07 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/7/2024) |
2024-02-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-01 | House | Original reference removed: State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | PCS added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2024-01-11 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-11 | House | Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2024-01-11 | House | Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-09 | House | Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-10-17 | House | Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-10-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-10-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-10-17 | House | Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-10-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H853 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S400 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
S7024 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 151
H5001 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Line Item Veto Message received
S2500 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
S400 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
S7024 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 151
H5001 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Line Item Veto Message received
S2500 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |