FL H0155 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to ensure that U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs sufficiently implements both letter & spirit of VA Maintaining Internal Systems & Strengthening Integrated Outside Networks (MISSION) Act of 2018.
Title
VA MISSION Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] | Rep. Tommy Gregory [R] | Rep. Walter Hill [R] | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] |
Rep. Chip LaMarca [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] | Rep. Jennifer Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-09-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S420 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/155 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/155/BillText/Filed/PDF |