FL H0163 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Florida Educational Student Advisory Council within DOE; establishes application process for membership on council; provides for appointment, membership, terms, & meetings of council; provides council powers & duties; requires district school board to establish student advisory program & designate districtwide association of student councils; provides for election of student advisors to district school board; provides powers & duties of district school boards, district school superintendents, & association of student councils.
Title
Student Involvement in Educational Governance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 19 | |
2011-10-03 | Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 20 | |
2011-09-19 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/163 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0163/BillText/Filed/HTML |