FL H0163 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs DHSMV to develop Ethical Ecotourism license plate; provides for distribution & use of fees collected from sale of plate.
Title
Specialty License Plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-09-29 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-09-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S424 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S364 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
S364 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/163 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/163/BillText/Filed/PDF |