FL H0259 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain FLVS full-time program & charter school students to participate in interscholastic extracurricular activities at private school.
Title
Interscholastic Extracurricular Activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Choice & Innovation Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Choice & Innovation Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113) |
2023-04-20 | House | Substituted CS/SB 190 |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023) |
2023-03-14 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-10 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2023-03-10 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-10 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-10 | House | Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Favorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-07 | House | Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda |
2023-01-25 | House | Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S190 (Same As) 2023-05-25 - Chapter No. 2023-113, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97)
H225 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-97; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
S308 (Similar To) 2023-04-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
H225 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-97; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
S308 (Similar To) 2023-04-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |