FL S0190 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Chapter No. 2023-113, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Chapter No. 2023-113, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing charter school students and Florida Virtual School full-time students to participate in extracurricular activities at a private school under certain circumstances; authorizing charter school students to participate in interscholastic extracurricular activities at a private school under certain circumstances; authorizing charter school students and Florida Virtual School full-time program students to participate in interscholastic extracurricular activities at a private school under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Interscholastic Extracurricular Activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#148 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Chapter No. 2023-113, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97) | |
2023-05-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-15 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 259 |
2023-04-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023) |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-03-24 | House | In Messages |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2023-03-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/23/23 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/08/23, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/21/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 02/07/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H259 (Same As) 2023-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
H225 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-97; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
S308 (Similar To) 2023-04-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
H225 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-97; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
S308 (Similar To) 2023-04-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2023-97), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2023-113)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |