FL H0267 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 724 (Ch. 2017-121)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 724 (Ch. 2017-121)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides decedent's property interest in protected homestead is included in elective estate; revises circumstances under which decedent's property interest in protected homestead is excluded; requires payment of interest on unpaid portion of person's required contribution toward elective share with respect to certain property; includes protected homestead in valuation of surviving spouse's interest in property; provides for award of fees & costs in certain proceedings; provides surviving spouse may require trustee of marital or elective share trust to make property productive of income.
Title
Estates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 724 (Ch. 2017-121) |
2017-04-27 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 724 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/24/17, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2017-03-17 | House | Now in Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-13 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/13/17, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0724 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-121
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
732 | 2025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 2151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
738 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/267 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0267/BillText/Filed/PDF |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/267/BillText/c1/PDF |