FL H0285 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes references to state attorney's discretion to direct file juvenile; revises discretionary direct file criteria; provides for opportunity for hearing to reverse direct file; revises provisions concerning housing of children held in detention.
Title
Direct Filing of an Information
Sponsors
Rep. James Bush [D] | Rep. Juan Fernandez-Barquin [R] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Ben Diamond [D] |
Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-10-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H421 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S610 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
S618 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S610 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
S618 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
985 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/285 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/285/BillText/Filed/PDF |