FL S0610 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising provisions concerning the housing of children held in detention; prohibiting a child who has been transferred to adult court for criminal prosecution pursuant to direct file from being held in a jail or other facility used for the detention of adults prior to a specified hearing to determine if the child should be prosecuted as an adult; deleting references to the state attorney's discretion to direct file a juvenile; revising discretionary direct file criteria, etc.
Title
Direct Filing of an Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H285 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H421 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S618 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H421 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S618 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
985 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 556 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/610 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/610/BillText/Filed/HTML |