FL H0305 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Chapter No. 2024-71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Chapter No. 2024-71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases maximum age of child victim of specified acts whose out of court statements may be admissible in certain circumstances; provides that first offense of specified sex trafficking offenses involving minors requires designation of defendant as sexual predator.
Title
Offenses Involving Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#544 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#544 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Chapter No. 2024-71 | |
2024-04-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-02-21 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-02-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 312 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Received |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-01-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-01-18 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2024-01-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-17 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Amendment 711849 adopted |
2024-01-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-11 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/17/2024) |
2024-01-09 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-08 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-01-08 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-22 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-12-18 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-13 | House | CS Filed |
2023-12-13 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-12-13 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-12 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-05 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-11-13 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-11-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-11-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-10-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S312 (Same As) 2024-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 305
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0139 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 553 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |