FL H0339 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Chapter No. 2023-279
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Chapter No. 2023-279
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises eligibility requirements for educational benefits provided by state to spouse or dependent child of deceased or disabled servicemember; revises eligibility requirements for educational benefits provided by state to dependent child of prisoner of war, person missing in action, or deceased or disabled servicemember who participated in certain military operations.
Title
Education of Dependents of Deceased or Disabled Servicemembers, Prisoners of War, and Persons Missing in Action
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#64 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#64 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Chapter No. 2023-279 | |
2023-06-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-04 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-31 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-03-31 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0 |
2023-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-30 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/30/2023) |
2023-03-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-03-15 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-13 | House | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-28 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-23 | House | CS Filed |
2023-02-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-02-23 | House | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-02-22 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-02-15 | House | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S550 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 339 (Ch. 2023-279)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
295 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 0185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 0195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |