FL H0345 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions for vehicles that may display amber light, payment of certain utility work necessitated by project on State Highway System located in rural areas of critical economic concern, & signs placed along state roads; provides for DOT to sell accounts receivable from certain leases.
Title
Transportation
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | Rep. Halsey Beshears [R] | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] | Rep. Marti Coley [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223) |
2014-04-29 | House | Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 218 |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-14 | House | CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-13 | House | CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/13/14, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2014-03-05 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2014-02-05 | House | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-02-04 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 02/04/14, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-11-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0218 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 5003 (Ch. 2014-53), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), SB 2514 (Ch. 2014-50)
H0259 (Similar To) 2013-11-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S1048 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H1161 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-215, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S1152 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H7175 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-223, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H0259 (Similar To) 2013-11-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S1048 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H1161 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-215, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
S1152 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H7175 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-223, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 2397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |