FL S1048 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the department to seek certain investors for certain leases; limiting the number of referenda that certain authorities may be subject to; specifying that a referendum applies to future bond issuances; amending provisions relating to outdoor advertising signs; providing that an outdoor advertising license is not required solely to erect or construct outdoor signs or structures; exempting from permitting certain signs placed by tourist-oriented businesses, certain farm signs placed during harvest seasons, certain acknowledgment signs on publicly funded school premises, and certain displays on specific sports facilities, etc.
Title
Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1161 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (744068, 746292) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/14 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by- Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/01/14, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/20/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0259 (Similar To) 2013-11-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H0345 (Similar To) 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
S0218 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 5003 (Ch. 2014-53), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), SB 2514 (Ch. 2014-50)
S0696 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
S1152 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H1161 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-215, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H7175 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-223, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H7005 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-216, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
H0345 (Similar To) 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
S0218 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-169, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 5003 (Ch. 2014-53), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), SB 2514 (Ch. 2014-50)
S0696 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223)
S1152 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H1161 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-215, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7175 (Ch. 2014-223), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H7175 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-223, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1161 (Ch. 2014-215), CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169)
H7005 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-216, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
339 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |