FL H0457 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for reduction in number of judges on 1st District Court of Appeal & 2nd District Court of Appeal upon occurrence of event that otherwise would have resulted in judicial vacancy; provides limitation on automatic reduction of judges; requires Chief Justice of Supreme Court to notify Governor & Legislature of occurrence of specified event.
Title
District Courts of Appeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-22 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S490 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/457 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/457/BillText/Filed/PDF |