FL H0509 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to licensure & regulation of clinical social workers, marriage & family therapists, & mental health counselors; revises provisions relating to interns in mental health profession.
Title
Clinical Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists, and Mental Health Counselors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H247 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S188 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
S884 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1042 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H7031 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
S188 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
S884 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1042 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H7031 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
414 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/509 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/509/BillText/Filed/PDF |