FL S0188 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising health care practitioner licensure application requirements; revising licensure requirements for a person seeking licensure or certification as an osteopathic physician; revising requirements for examinations of dental hygienists; revising athletic trainer licensure requirements; revising qualifications for licensure as a massage therapist; revising requirements for licensure by endorsement or certification for specified professions, etc.
Title
Department of Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#346 (Y: 76 N: 34 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-05-03 | Senate | In returning messages |
2019-05-03 | House | Insisted on amendment , and requested the Senate to concur |
2019-05-03 | House | Insisted on amendment (822543) |
2019-05-02 | House | In returning messages |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Requested House to recede |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (822543) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | In returning messages |
2019-05-01 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 76 NAYS 34 |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (822543) |
2019-04-30 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Received |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | In Messages |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2019-03-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/14/19 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/07/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/20/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H247 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H509 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S884 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1042 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S1078 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H7031 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
H851 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-152
H509 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S884 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1042 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S1078 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H7031 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2019-152)
H851 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-152
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 4018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 347 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
460 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
460 | 4166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 00673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 723 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |