FL H0619 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes electronic billboards to be placed on certain agricultural lands.
Title
Placement of Electronic Billboards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1666 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/619 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/619/BillText/Filed/PDF |