FL H0669 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definitions of cyberstalk & access; revises conduct constituting offense against users of computers, computer systems, computer networks, or electronic devices.
Title
Offenses Involving Computers
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Michael Grieco [D] | Rep. David Silvers [D] |
Rep. Tyler Sirois [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-03 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-27 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-14 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S916 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
815 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
815 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |