FL S0916 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "cyberstalk" as the term relates to prohibited acts; providing that a person commits an offense against users of certain electronic devices if he or she willfully, knowingly, and exceeding authorization performs specified acts, etc.
Title
Technology Crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-14 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H669 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
815 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
847 | 0141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
901 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |