FL H0687 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes candidate to use funds on deposit in his or her campaign account to pay for child care expenses under specified conditions.
Title
Use of Campaign Funds for Child Care Expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-19 | House | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-12-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1160 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/687 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/687/BillText/Filed/PDF |