FL H0689 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain reports relating to the transportation or possession of cigarettes be filed with the Division of Alcoholic Beverages and Tobacco through the division's electronic data submission system; renaming the Florida State Boxing Commission as the Florida Athletic Commission; authorizing a condominium association to extinguish discriminatory restrictions, etc.
Title
Department of Business and Professional Regulation
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | House Business and Professions Subcommittee | Rep. Anthony Rodriguez [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#634 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#634 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in returning Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-12 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-12 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (559554) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted for SB 912 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 1 |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (132627, 288565) 986 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (983661) 934 |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-03 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | CS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-20 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-28 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-16 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-16 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-15 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-11-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S912 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 689
H623 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S1154 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
H733 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1257 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10
S374 (Similar To) 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-164
S802 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1494 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1752 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H623 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S1154 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
H733 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1257 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10
S374 (Similar To) 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-164
S802 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1494 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1752 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
194 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
210 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
326 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 077 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
712 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 5014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |