FL H1257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain associations may represent, prosecute, or defend owners in certain proceedings; providing unit or parcel owners options for defending a tax suit; authorizing the Division of Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes to adopt rules, etc.
Title
Community Associations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#622 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (760695) 978 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (355827, 512527) 901 |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-03 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Favorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/03/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H623 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H1317 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
S1154 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1752 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10
H689 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
H1317 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
S1154 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1752 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10
H689 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
194 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |