FL H0711 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Chapter No. 2014-164, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 709 (Ch. 2014-163)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Chapter No. 2014-164, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 709 (Ch. 2014-163)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for research grant applications provided to Alzheimer's Disease Research Grant Advisory Board under Ed & Ethel Moore Alzheimer's Disease Research Program & records generated by board relating to review of applications; provides exemption from public meetings requirements for those portions of meetings of board during which research grant applications are discussed; requires recording of closed portions of meetings; provides for legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity; provides for contingent effect.
Title
Public Meetings and Public Records/Alzheimer's Disease Research Grant Advisory Board
Sponsors
House Government Operations Subcommittee | House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. Matt Hudson [R] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
Rep. Patrick Rooney [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#773 (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#773 (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Chapter No. 2014-164, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 709 (Ch. 2014-163) | |
2014-06-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-05-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 840 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-28 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 2 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (194953) |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/27/14, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2014-03-20 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-18 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/18/14, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2014-03-10 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-10 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2014-03-07 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-05 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 9:00 am, 306 HOB |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0709 (Related) 2014-06-18 - Chapter No. 2014-163, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 711 (Ch. 2014-164)
S0840 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 711 (Ch. 2014-164), CS/CS/HB 709 (Ch. 2014-163)
S0872 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 709 (Ch. 2014-163), CS/CS/HB 711 (Ch. 2014-164)
S0840 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 711 (Ch. 2014-164), CS/CS/HB 709 (Ch. 2014-163)
S0872 (Similar To) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 709 (Ch. 2014-163), CS/CS/HB 711 (Ch. 2014-164)