FL H0711 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides maximum tax that may be collected on each aircraft sale & use.
Title
Aircraft Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-21 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2023-02-10 | House | Filed |