FL H0765 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires CFO to annually certify amount of specified unencumbered & undispersed endowment funds by specified date; allocating portion of reverted funds to board of trustees of USF; requires such funds be used to support university's Heart Health Institute; provides conditions for use of funds; prohibits funds from being used to secure debt; requires CFO to notify USF's board of trustees if balance transfer will not occur during given year.
Title
Lawton Chiles Endowment Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1656 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/765 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/765/BillText/Filed/PDF |