FL H0771 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating Florida Motor Vehicle No-Fault Law; revises garage liability insurance requirements; revises minimum coverage requirements for proof of financial responsibility for motor vehicles; revises amount of certificate of deposit required to elect certain method of proof of financial responsibility; revises excess liability coverage requirements; revises financial responsibility requirements for owners or lessees of for-hire passenger transportation vehicles; revises coverages of motor vehicle policy which are subject to stacking prohibition; revises insurance requirements for transportation network company drivers.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Grall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 7 |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-02-11 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 4 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-11-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S378 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H731 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-156
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H731 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-156
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 646 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 0221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 0222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 989 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 06501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0652 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0653 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 727 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7278 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 728 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 733 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 734 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 737 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 739 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 747 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 748 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 749 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 8405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
628 | 909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |