FL H0825 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 4, Art. VII of State Constitution to revise Legislature's authority to exempt renewable energy source devices from consideration in determining assessed value of real property by removing restriction that limits such exemptions to property used for residential purposes & restricting such exemptions to renewable energy source devices installed by end-use customer whose primary intent is offset part or all of the customer's electricity demands.
Title
Ad Valorem Assessments/Renewable Energy Source Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0827 (Related) 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
S0916 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
S0922 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
S0916 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
S0922 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/825 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0825/BillText/Filed/PDF |