FL S0922 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting consideration by a property appraiser of the increased value of real property due to the installation of a renewable energy source device by an end-use customer; revising the definition of the term "renewable energy source device", etc.
Title
Renewable Energy Source Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/01/14, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 03/04/14, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Rules |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0916 (Related) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
H0827 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
H0825 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
H0827 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
H0825 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/922 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0922/BillText/Filed/HTML |