FL H0875 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Chapter No. 2013-221
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Chapter No. 2013-221
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides penalties for unlicensed person who engages in activity for which ch. 493, F.S., requires license; provides exception; provides penalties if person commits felony while impersonating security officer, private investigator, recovery agent, or other person required to have license under ch. 493, F.S.; authorizes licensed security officer or licensed security agency manager to detain person on premises of critical infrastructure facility in certain circumstances; provides procedures & requirements with respect thereto; authorizes security officer or security agency manager to search person detained; provides identification requirements for certain licensed security officers & security agency managers; provides immunity to law enforcement officers, licensed security officers, & licensed security agency managers.
Title
Licensed Security Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#49 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#152 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#152 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | Chapter No. 2013-221 | |
2013-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1330 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-17 | House | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/13, 8:30 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/28/13, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-19 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1330 (Same As) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 875 (Ch. 2013-221)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
493 | 6120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 631 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |