FL H0939 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises county population thresholds for purposes of identifying the governmental entity responsible for payment of aerial photographs & maps.
Title
Aerial Photographs and Nonproperty Ownership Maps
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2015-12-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1488 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
H7099 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Chapter No. 2016-220, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
H7099 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Chapter No. 2016-220, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/939 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0939/BillText/Filed/PDF |